Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Kevin James Sweeney

Bishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1970 Born
28 Jun 199727.4Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
15 Apr 202050.2AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
1 Jul 202050.4Ordained BishopBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Kevin James Sweeney
Bishop Kevin James Sweeney (born ) Bishop of Paterson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElmhurst, Queens, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained PriestSt. James, Cathedral Basilica, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopSaint John the Baptist, Cathedral, Paterson, Diocese of Paterson, New Jersey

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paterson.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2020
  • c1: CB, 15 Apr 2020
  • ob/c2+: CB, 17 May 2020
  • mn: CB, 24 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 1 Jul 2020

Quantcast