Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignatius Anthony Catanello

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Deultum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1938Born
28 May 196627.8Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Jun 199455.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Jun 199455.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Deultum
22 Aug 199456.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Deultum
20 Sep 201072.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
11 Mar 201374.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Ignatius Anthony Catanello (VIAF: 48941565)
Bishop Ignatius Anthony Catanello (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Perpetual Help, Basilica, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 46.7 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Sep 2010
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,360
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 17 Jul 2018

Quantcast