Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerald Michael Barbarito

Bishop of Palm Beach, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1950 BornBrooklyn
31 Jan 197626.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Jun 199444.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
28 Jun 199444.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Gisipa
22 Aug 199444.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gisipa
26 Oct 199949.8AppointedBishop of Ogdensburg, New York, USA
1 Jul 200353.4AppointedBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA
28 Aug 200353.6InstalledBishop of Palm Beach, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Gerald Michael Barbarito:
Bishop Gerald Michael Barbarito (born ) Bishop of Palm Beach

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Palm Beach.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139, Number 12,361

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015