Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Frank Joseph Caggiano

Bishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Mar 1959 BornBrooklyn
16 May 198728.1Ordained PriestPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Jun 200647.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Jun 200647.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
22 Aug 200647.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Inis Cathaig
31 Jul 201354.3AppointedBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA
19 Sep 201354.4InstalledBishop of Bridgeport, Connecticut, USA

MicroData Summary for Frank Joseph Caggiano:
Bishop Frank Joseph Caggiano (born ) Bishop of Bridgeport

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bridgeport.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2006
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,225
  • c1: CB, 11 May 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Jul 2013
  • i: CB, 31 Jul 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015