Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Riley

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Regiae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1900Born
20 May 192726.4Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
31 Oct 195958.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
31 Oct 195958.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Regiae
21 Dec 195959.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Regiae
28 Jun 197675.5RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
17 Aug 197776.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Riley
Bishop Thomas Joseph Riley (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaltham

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 17.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 May 2017