Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Marie Guy Sansaricq

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

Titular Bishop of Glenndálocha


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1934Born
29 Jun 196025.7Ordained PriestPriest of Les Cayes, Haïti
9 Jan 199156.2IncardinatedPriest of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Jun 200671.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
6 Jun 200671.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
22 Aug 200671.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Glenndálocha
6 Oct 201076.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Brooklyn, New York, USA
21 Aug 202186.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Pierre Marie Guy Sansaricq
Bishop Pierre Marie Guy Sansaricq (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Brooklyn

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJérémie, Haïti
Ordained PriestCathedral, Port-au-Prince, Archdiocese of Port-au-Prince, Haïti
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Angels, Church, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Death PlaceRectory, St. Gregory the Great, Brooklyn, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York
Buried Place (Original)Bishop Chapel Crypt, Douglaston, Diocese of Brooklyn, New York

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Jun 2006
  • c2: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,223
  • r: Bollettino, 6 Oct 2010
  • mn: CB, 1 Jul 2016
  • d: CB, 21 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Aug 2021

Quantcast