Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Michalski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

Titular Bishop of Vagal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Nov 1914Born
3 Jun 193924.5Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
6 Dec 197561.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
6 Dec 197561.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Vagal
21 Dec 197561.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vagal
22 Apr 198974.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Gniezno, Poland
23 Aug 198974.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno, Poland

MicroData Summary for Jan Michalski
Bishop Jan Michalski (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Gniezno

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBydgoszcz
Ordained BishopGniezno, Archdiocese of Gniezno

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob/c5: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 34, Number 2,088
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 67, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast