Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esprit-Marie-Joseph Floren, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Siam

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1762BornLagnes, France
1786²23.5Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
29 Jun 181048.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
29 Jun 181048.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
4 Mar 181148.7SucceededVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand
12 Apr 181249.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
30 Mar 183471.8DiedVicar Apostolic of Siam, Thailand

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Esprit-Marie-Joseph Floren
Bishop Esprit-Marie-Joseph Floren M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Siam

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1812, Number 6
  • b: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 350

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Jul 2016