Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Benjamin Longer, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

Titular Bishop of Gortyna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1752BornLe Havre, France
23 Sep 177523.3Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
3 Apr 178734.8AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
3 Apr 178734.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Gortyna
17 Aug 178937.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam
30 Sep 179240.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gortyna
8 Feb 183178.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}, Viet Nam

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Benjamin Longer:
Bishop Jacques-Benjamin Longer M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Western Tonking {Tonkino Occidentale}

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 38.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: LC

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013