Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William Mark Duke

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia

Titular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1879BornSaint John, New Brunswick
29 Jun 190525.7Ordained PriestPriest of Saint John, New Brunswick, Canada
10 Aug 192848.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
10 Aug 192848.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Phasis
18 Oct 192849.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Phasis
5 Oct 193152.0SucceededArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
11 Mar 196484.4RetiredArchbishop of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada
11 Mar 196484.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Seleucia in Isauria
31 Aug 197191.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Vancouver, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for William Mark Duke:
Archbishop William Mark Duke (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Vancouver

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013