Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Blaise-Ernest Morand

Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1932 BornTecumseh
22 Mar 195825.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Apr 198148.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
29 Jun 198148.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
9 Apr 198350.6SucceededBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada
26 May 200875.7RetiredBishop of Prince-Albert, Saskatchewan, Canada

MicroData Summary for Blaise-Ernest Morand:
Bishop Blaise-Ernest Morand (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Prince-Albert

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Prince-Albert.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 26 May 2008

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013