Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maximilian Gereon von Galen

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Myrina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1832Born
26 Jul 185623.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
16 Jul 189562.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
16 Jul 189562.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Myrina
25 Jul 189562.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Myrina
5 Nov 190876.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Maximilian Gereon von Galen (VIAF: 80709837)
Bishop Maximilian Gereon von Galen (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMünster, Diocese of Münster
Ordained BishopCollege Germanique, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 52.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 399
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,895, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast