Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Coro

Archidioecesis Corensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 23 November 1998
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Venezuela
  • Square Kilometers: 24,800 (9,579 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Apartado 7342, Calle Federacion Esquina Calle Palmasola, Coro, Edo. Falcon, Venezuela
  • Telephone: (0268)251.79.30; 251.70.24
  • Fax: 251.88.68

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Coro
12 October 1922ErectedDiocese of Barquisimeto Diocese of Coro (erected)
12 July 1997Territory LostDiocese of Coro Diocese of Punto Fijo (erected)
Archdiocese of Coro
23 November 1998ElevatedDiocese of Coro Archdiocese of Coro

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Coro
1949268,0001314279,925163872ap1951
1966366,000369,70099.0%3721586,310367534ap1967
1970423,211.0%2626520406237ap1971
1976437,761451,30097.0%2426508,755467640ap1977
1980498,000513,00097.1%2427519,764439142ap1981
1990590,000613,64996.1%29204912,0404286837ap1991
Archdiocese of Coro
1999433,198462,17693.7%2973612,033473927ap2000
2000433,198462,17693.7%2873512,377474428ap2001
2001497,898560,17688.9%4064610,823464229ap2002
2002596,196658,47490.5%4074712,685474329ap2003
2003636,150687,02592.6%4485212,2337144536ap2004
2004449,849518,72686.7%569656,9207153635ap2005
2006458,000529,00086.6%579666,9397173839ap2007
2011516,000600,00086.0%567638,1906204240ap2014

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.2, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 10 Nov 2014