Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón José Aponte Fernández

Bishop of Valle de la Pascua, Venezuela


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1948 Born
17 Aug 197425.9Ordained PriestPriest of Trujillo, Venezuela
5 Mar 200455.4AppointedBishop of Valle de la Pascua, Venezuela
22 May 200455.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valle de la Pascua, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Ramón José Aponte Fernández
Bishop Ramón José Aponte Fernández (born ) Bishop of Valle de la Pascua

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarache

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valle de la Pascua.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 175, Number 14,597
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast