Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enzo Ceccarelli Catraro, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Ayacucho

Titular Bishop of Ruspae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1918BornAlberti
31 Aug 194729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
5 Oct 197456.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela
5 Oct 197456.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ruspae
15 Dec 197456.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ruspae
23 Oct 198971.1ResignedVicar Apostolic of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela
15 Nov 199880.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Ayacucho, Venezuela

MicroData Summary for Enzo Ceccarelli Catraro:
Bishop Enzo Ceccarelli Catraro S.D.B. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Puerto Ayacucho

  • a priest for 51.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 146
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1995, Page 942
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013