Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Leo Higi

Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette in Indiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1933 BornAnderson
30 May 195925.8Ordained PriestPriest of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
7 Apr 198450.6AppointedBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
6 Jun 198450.8Ordained BishopBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA
12 May 201076.7RetiredBishop of Lafayette in Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for William Leo Higi:
Bishop William Leo Higi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Lafayette in Indiana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lafayette in Indiana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 May 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013