Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Luigi Cardinal Capotosti

Deceased

Datary of the Apostolic Datary

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1863BornMontegiberto
19 Sep 188522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Fermo, Italy
29 Apr 190845.2AppointedBishop of Modigliana, Italy
31 May 190845.3Ordained BishopBishop of Modigliana, Italy
15 Nov 190845.7InstalledBishop of Modigliana, Italy
8 Jun 191451.3AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
22 Jan 191551.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Thermae Basilicae
21 Jun 192663.3Elevated to Cardinal
21 Jun 192663.3ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
24 Jun 192663.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
29 Jul 193168.4AppointedPro-Datary of the Apostolic Datary
23 Sep 193370.6AppointedDatary of the Apostolic Datary
16 Feb 193875.0DiedDatary of the Apostolic Datary

MicroData Summary for Luigi Capotosti:
Cardinal Luigi Capotosti (born , died ) Datary of Apostolic Datary

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 29.7 years
  • a cardinal for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 366
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1908, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013