Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Gaston Laperrine d’Hautpoul

Deceased

Official of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

Titular Bishop of Carystus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1848Born
4 Mar 187122.8Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 191061.9AppointedOfficial of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation
14 Jun 191567.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Carystus
29 Jun 191567.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Carystus
24 Nov 191971.5DiedOfficial of the Sacred Consistorial Congregation

MicroData Summary for Paul-Gaston Laperrine d’Hautpoul
Bishop Paul-Gaston Laperrine d’Hautpoul (born , died ) Official of Sacred Consistorial Congregation

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Eulalie, France

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,920
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,915, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast