Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Sidoli

Deceased

Archbishop of Genova, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1874Born
20 Jun 191641.6AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
25 Jul 191641.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
24 Mar 192449.3AppointedArchbishop of Genova, Italy
18 Dec 192450.1DiedArchbishop of Genova, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Sidoli
Archbishop Francesco Sidoli (born , died ) Archbishop of Genova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCereseto

  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1925
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1916, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast