Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ernesto Eugenio Filippi

Deceased

Archbishop of Monreale


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1879BornCollelungo
21 Sep 190122.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jul 192142.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Serdica
22 Jul 192142.1AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
7 Aug 192142.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Serdica
31 Mar 192343.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to Turkey
6 Apr 192545.8AppointedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy
23 Aug 195172.2DiedArchbishop of Monreale, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Eugenio Filippi:
Archbishop Ernesto Eugenio Filippi (born , died ) Archbishop of Monreale

  • a priest for 49.9 years
  • a bishop for 30.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015