Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Goroka

Dioecesis Gorokanus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Francesco Sarego, S.V.D., Bishop
  • Michael Marai, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 November 1966
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Mount Hagen
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Papua New Guinea
  • Square Kilometers: 7,400 (2,858 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 109, Goroka, E.H.P., Papua New Guinea
  • Telephone: 732-1798
  • Fax: 732-2957

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Goroka
18 June 1959ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Alexishafen Vicariate Apostolic of Goroka (erected)
Diocese of Goroka
15 November 1966ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Goroka Diocese of Goroka
8 June 1982Territory LostDiocese of Goroka Diocese of Kundiawa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Goroka
197076,327410,00018.6%227292,63114819ap1971
198086,126350,45024.6%119204,3061301415ap1981
199018,000300,0006.0%214161,12526309ap1991
199913,647310,0004.4%12121,13722218ap2000
200013,627315,0004.3%111121,13521209ap2001
200113,113385,0003.4%2121493622229ap2002
200214,000385,0003.6%3121593321218ap2003
200315,932390,0004.1%210121,32717198ap2004
200413,500429,4803.1%28101,35014219ap2005
200616,393440,0003.7%210121,36615249ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2011
code: v2.7.5, 23 Nov 2011; data: 12 Dec 2011