Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hermann Raich, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Wabag


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1934BornJerzens, Austria
29 Apr 196227.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
8 Mar 198247.8AppointedBishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
29 Apr 198247.9Ordained BishopBishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
30 Jun 200874.1RetiredBishop of Wabag, Papua New Guinea
9 Oct 200975.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Wabag, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Hermann Raich:
Bishop Hermann Raich S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Wabag

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 27.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2008
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015