Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Pontianak

Archidioecesis Pontianakensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 3 January 1961
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Indonesia
  • Square Kilometers: 39,840 (15,388 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Keuskupan Agung, Jl. A.R. Hakim 92 A, P.O. Box 1119, Pontianak 78001, Kalimantan Barat, Indonesia
  • Telephone: (0561)732.382
  • Fax: 738.785

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}
11 February 1905ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Batavia Prefecture Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese} (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}
13 March 1918ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese} Vicariate Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese}
21 May 1938Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese} Prefecture Apostolic of Bandjarmasin (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontianak
21 May 1938Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Dutch Borneo {Borneo Olandese} Vicariate Apostolic of Pontianak
11 March 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Pontianak Prefecture Apostolic of Sintang (erected)
14 June 1954Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Pontianak Prefecture Apostolic of Ketapang (erected)
Archdiocese of Pontianak
3 January 1961ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Pontianak Archdiocese of Pontianak
9 April 1968Territory LostDiocese of Ketapang
Archdiocese of Pontianak
Prefecture Apostolic of Sekadau (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Pontianak
195010,747987,0001.1%49492192412015ap1951
Archdiocese of Pontianak
197048,8041,091,2444.5%44441,1099316817ap1971
1980105,4041,595,0006.6%345482,19598147ap1981
1990115,2081,956,1305.9%235373,1136317117ap1991
1999193,6672,271,2568.5%743503,8737227818ap2000
2000201,8702,321,0118.7%749563,6047824418ap2001
2001215,0782,367,4319.1%748553,9107825619ap2002
2002221,2492,417,1469.2%751583,8148124919ap2003
2003231,8812,467,9069.4%854623,7408728319ap2004
2004243,9232,477,9069.8%962713,4359629620ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 13 Apr 2013