Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pius Riana Prapdi

Bishop of Ketapang


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1967 BornPainiai
8 Jul 199528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Semarang, Indonesia
25 Jun 201245.1AppointedBishop of Ketapang, Indonesia
9 Sep 201245.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ketapang, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Pius Riana Prapdi:
Bishop Pius Riana Prapdi (born ) Bishop of Ketapang

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ketapang.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jun 2012
  • ob: CB, 3 Aug 2012
  • c2+: CB, 8 Sep 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,538

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013