Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Baptiste Étienne Honoré Penon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Moulins

Titular Bishop of Cusae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 May 1850BornSimiane
7 Jun 187323.0Ordained PriestPriest of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
8 May 191161.0AppointedBishop of Moulins, France
27 Jun 191161.1Ordained BishopBishop of Moulins, France
21 Jun 192676.1RetiredBishop of Moulins, France
21 Jun 192676.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Cusae
7 Sep 192979.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Moulins, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Baptiste Étienne Honoré Penon:
Bishop Jean Baptiste Étienne Honoré Penon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Moulins

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 18.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • c2: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013