Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cirilo B. Flores

Deceased

Bishop of San Diego, California, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1948Born
8 Jun 199142.9Ordained PriestPriest of Orange in California, USA
5 Jan 200960.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Orange in California, USA
5 Jan 200960.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Quiza
19 Mar 200960.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quiza
4 Jan 201263.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Diego, California, USA
18 Sep 201365.2SucceededBishop of San Diego, California, USA
6 Sep 201466.2DiedBishop of San Diego, California, USA

MicroData Summary for Cirilo B. Flores
Bishop Cirilo B. Flores (born , died ) Bishop of San Diego

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorona, CA

  • a priest for 23.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2: Website of the Diocese
  • c2+: CB
  • ab: Bollettino, 4 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,066
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2013
  • d: CB, 6 Sep 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast