Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tadeusz Bronakowski

Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland

Titular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1959 Born
26 May 198424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Łomża, Poland
11 Feb 200646.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Łomża, Poland
11 Feb 200646.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania
4 Mar 200646.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tigisi in Mauretania

MicroData Summary for Tadeusz Bronakowski
Bishop Tadeusz Bronakowski (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Łomża

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAugustów

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Łomża.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,084

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast