Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Walla Walla

Dioecesis Valle-Valliensis

Suppressed



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
24 July 1846ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Oregon Territory Diocese of Walla Walla (erected)
31 May 1850SuppressedDiocese of Walla Walla (suppressed) Diocese of Nesqually (erected)
29 July 1853SuppressedDiocese of Walla Walla (suppressed)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 12 Aug 2012