Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Perlo, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kenya

Titular Bishop of Maronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1873BornCaramagna, Italy
10 Aug 189522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
15 Jul 190936.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kenya, Kenya
15 Jul 190936.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Maronea
23 Oct 190936.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Maronea
18 Nov 192552.8ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kenya, Kenya
16 Feb 192653.0AppointedSuperior General of Consolata Missionaries
11 Jan 192955.9ResignedSuperior General of Consolata Missionaries
4 Nov 194875.7DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kenya, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Filippo Perlo:
Bishop Filippo Perlo I.M.C. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kenya

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1949
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013