Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joannes de Reeper, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Kisumu, Kenya


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1902Born
17 Jul 192724.6Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
15 Jan 196057.1AppointedPrefect of Ngong, Kenya
16 Jan 196461.1AppointedBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
19 Mar 196461.3Ordained BishopBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
20 Mar 197673.3RetiredBishop of Kisumu, Kenya
28 Nov 198078.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Kisumu, Kenya

MicroData Summary for Joannes de Reeper
Bishop Joannes de Reeper M.H.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Kisumu

EventPlace
Birth Place's-Hertogenbosch, Netherlands

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast