Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father George Shanks, M.H.M. †

Deceased

Prefect of Kashmir and Jammu, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1909Born
17 Sep 193324.5Ordained PriestPriest of St. Joseph’s Missionary Society of Mill Hill
30 May 195243.2AppointedPrefect of Kashmir and Jammu, India
13 Dec 196253.8DiedPrefect of Kashmir and Jammu, India

MicroData Summary for George Shanks
Father George Shanks M.H.M. (born , died ) Prefect of Kashmir and Jammu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCullercoats, North Shields, Diocese of Hexham and Newcastle, England, Great Britain
Death PlaceSt. Andrew's, Hospital, Dollis Hill, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 29.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • loc: CL, 23 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.1, 12 Sep 2018; Data: 26 Sep 2018

Quantcast