Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tororo

Archidioecesis Tororoensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Emmanuel Obbo, A.J., Archbishop
  • Denis Kiwanuka Lote, Archbishop Emeritus
  • James Odongo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 2 January 1999
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uganda
  • Square Kilometers: 8,837 (3,413 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.adtororo.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 632, Tororo, Uganda
  • Telephone: (077)25.25.182
  • Fax: (045)44.45.255

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}
13 July 1894ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Victoria-Nyanza Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore} (erected)
15 July 1925Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore} Prefecture Apostolic of Kavirondo (erected)
10 June 1948Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore} Vicariate Apostolic of Kampala (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tororo
10 May 1951Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore} Vicariate Apostolic of Tororo
Diocese of Tororo
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Tororo Diocese of Tororo
29 November 1980Territory LostDiocese of Tororo Diocese of Soroti (erected)
Archdiocese of Tororo
2 January 1999ElevatedDiocese of Tororo Archdiocese of Tororo

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Upper Nile {Nilo Superiore}
1950209,357700,00029.9%770772,71812325ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Tororo
Diocese of Tororo
1970497,097509,85597.5%303016,5692014745ap1971
1980667,8462,103,00031.8%3829679,9674912547ap1981
1990425,9111,573,00027.1%5511666,4532111035ap1991
Archdiocese of Tororo
1999405,7421,609,04425.2%537606,7622511236ap2000
2000450,0001,700,00026.5%558637,1422111636ap2001
2001500,0001,700,00029.4%529618,1962312936ap2002
2002550,0002,000,00027.5%5813717,7462414636ap2003
2003550,0002,500,00022.0%5714717,7462413637ap2004
2004550,0002,500,00022.0%5819777,1423115137ap2005
2010665,0003,030,00021.9%8211937,1502717540ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 2 Jan 2014