Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benigno Luciano Migliorini, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano e Ortona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1881BornMalo
26 Jul 190422.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Feb 193755.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Palestrina, Italy
20 Feb 193755.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Lete
7 Mar 193755.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lete
19 Jul 194159.8AppointedBishop of Rieti (-S. Salvatore Maggiore), Italy
13 Mar 195169.4AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy
1 Jul 196280.7DiedArchbishop of Lanciano e Ortona, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benigno Luciano Migliorini:
Archbishop Benigno Luciano Migliorini O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop of Lanciano e Ortona

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 13
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,494

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013