Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas-Paul-Henri Lemonnier

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1853Born
1877¹23.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rouen, France
13 Jul 190652.8AppointedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
8 Aug 190652.8Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
29 Dec 192774.2DiedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas-Paul-Henri Lemonnier
Bishop Thomas-Paul-Henri Lemonnier (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtretat

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 77
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast