Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop André Marceau

Bishop of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1946 BornCérons (Gironde)
25 Mar 197225.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
13 Jan 200457.7AppointedBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
7 Mar 200457.8Ordained BishopBishop of Perpignan-Elne, France
6 Mar 201467.8AppointedBishop of Nice, France
11 May 201468.0InstalledBishop of Nice, France

MicroData Summary for André Marceau:
Bishop André Marceau (born ) Bishop of Nice

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Nice.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Number 14,544
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2014
  • i: CB, 8 Mar 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Mar 2014