Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Suetta

Bishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1962 Born
4 Oct 198623.8Ordained PriestPriest of Albenga-Imperia, Italy
25 Jan 201451.1AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
1 Mar 201451.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy
9 Mar 201451.2InstalledBishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Suetta
Bishop Antonio Suetta (born ) Bishop of Ventimiglia-San Remo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoano
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni Battista, Co-Cathedral, Imperia, Diocese of Albenga-Imperia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ventimiglia-San Remo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 31 Jan 2014
  • i: CB, 3 Feb 2014
  • c34: CB, 1 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,109

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast