Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Corrado Sanguineti

Bishop of Pavia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1964 BornMilano
30 Oct 198823.9Ordained PriestPriest of Chiavari, Italy
16 Nov 201551.0AppointedBishop of Pavia, Italy
9 Jan 201651.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pavia, Italy
24 Jan 201651.2InstalledBishop of Pavia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Corrado Sanguineti:
Bishop Corrado Sanguineti (born ) Bishop of Pavia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Pavia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 16 Nov 2015
  • ob/i/c1: CB, 16 Nov 2015
  • c2+: CB, 24 Dec 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 24 Dec 2015