Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Marco Tasca, O.F.M. Conv.

Archbishop-Elect of Genova {Genoa}, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jun 1957 Born
29 Sep 196811.3EnteredMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
17 Sep 197720.2Temporary VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
28 Nov 198124.4Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
19 Mar 198325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
26 May 200749.9AppointedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
25 May 201961.9CeasedMinister General of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 May 202062.9AppointedArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
11 Jul 202063.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Tasca
Father Marco Tasca O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Archbishop-Elect of Genova {Genoa}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSant’Angelo di Piove di Sacco, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained PriestSan Michele Arcangelo, Church, Sant’Angelo di Piove di Sacco, Diocese of Padova {Padua}
Ordained BishopGenova, Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}

Please contact the Father through the Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2020
  • temp/c1: CB, 9 May 2020
  • ob/c2: CB, 29 May 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 May 2020

Quantcast