Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicol˛ Anselmi

Auxiliary Bishop of Genova {Genoa}

Titular Bishop of Utica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1961 BornGenova
9 May 199231.0Ordained PriestPriest of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
10 Jan 201553.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Genova {Genoa}, Italy
10 Jan 201553.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Utica
8 Feb 201553.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utica

MicroData Summary for Nicol˛ Anselmi:
Bishop Nicol˛ Anselmi (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Genova {Genoa}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Genova {Genoa}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Jan 2015
  • ob: CB, 10 Jan 2015
  • c1: CB, 10 Jan 2015
  • c2: CB, 14 Jan 2015
  • c34: CB, 3 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,365

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015