Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Joseph-Aloys Munsch, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kilima-Njaro

Titular Bishop of Magnesia ad Maeandrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1869BornFellering, France
28 Oct 189425.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
13 Sep 191040.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro, Tanzania
13 Sep 191040.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Magnesia ad Maeandrum
5 Feb 191141.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Magnesia ad Maeandrum
16 Jan 192252.3ResignedVicar Apostolic of Kilima-Njaro, Tanzania
28 Dec 194273.2DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kilima-Njaro, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Marie-Joseph-Aloys Munsch:
Bishop Marie-Joseph-Aloys Munsch C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Kilima-Njaro

  • a priest for 48.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013