Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alessio Cardinal Ascalesi, C.Pp.S. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Oct 1872BornCasalnuovo
8 Jun 189522.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Precious Blood
29 Apr 190936.5AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
8 Aug 190936.8Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
19 Jun 191138.7AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
9 Dec 191543.1AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
4 Dec 191644.1Elevated to Cardinal
7 Dec 191644.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
7 Mar 192451.4AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
11 May 195279.6DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alessio Ascalesi:
Cardinal Alessio Ascalesi C.Pp.S. (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
  • a cardinal for 35.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 40, and Page 84
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013