Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Castaldo

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

Cardinal-Priest of San Callisto

Bishop of Pozzuoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Nov 1890BornCasoria
8 Jun 191322.6Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
27 Mar 193443.4AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
30 Jun 193443.6Ordained BishopBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
14 Jan 195059.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
14 Jan 195059.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thessalonica
14 Jan 195059.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Pozzuoli, Italy
7 Feb 195867.3AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
5 Aug 195867.7AppointedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
15 Dec 195868.1Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 195868.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Callisto
3 Mar 196675.3DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Castaldo:
Cardinal Alfonso Castaldo (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
  • a cardinal for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 55
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013