Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Palatucci, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Campagna, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1892Born
25 May 191523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Sep 193745.4AppointedBishop of Campagna, Italy
28 Nov 193745.5Ordained BishopBishop of Campagna, Italy
31 Mar 196168.9DiedBishop of Campagna, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Palatucci
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Palatucci O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop of Campagna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontella

  • a priest for 45.8 years
  • a bishop for 23.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1960
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1962
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast