Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Mangino

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1883Born
22 Sep 190622.7Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 193653.0AppointedBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
18 Apr 193753.3Ordained BishopBishop of Muro Lucano, Italy
18 Feb 194662.1AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
26 May 196581.4DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Mangino
Bishop Bartolomeo Mangino (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

EventPlace
Birth PlacePagani

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast