Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Reginaldo Giuseppe Maria Addazi, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

Titular Archbishop of Risinium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1899Born
25 Jul 192626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
10 Nov 194747.9AppointedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
4 Jan 194848.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
3 Jul 197171.5ResignedArchbishop of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy
3 Jul 197171.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Risinium
7 Feb 197575.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie), Italy

MicroData Summary for Reginaldo Giuseppe Maria Addazi
Archbishop Reginaldo Giuseppe Maria Addazi O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Trani e Barletta (e Nazareth e Bisceglie)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGrottammare

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast