Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Capobianco

Deceased

Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jun 1879Born
20 Dec 190223.4Ordained PriestPriest of Spoleto, Italy
26 May 193353.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spoleto, Italy
26 May 193353.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
2 Jul 193354.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hephaestus
1 Apr 193555.7AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
7 Apr 196585.7DiedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Capobianco
Bishop Giovanni Capobianco (born , died ) Bishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBevagna

  • a priest for 62.2 years
  • a bishop for 31.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: JPG
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1933, Number 46

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast