Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Noviello

Deceased

Bishop of Alife, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Aug 1875Born
23 Dec 189823.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 193054.9AppointedBishop of Alife, Italy
31 Aug 193055.0Ordained BishopBishop of Alife, Italy
20 Sep 194772.1DiedBishop of Alife, Italy

MicroData Summary for Luigi Noviello
Bishop Luigi Noviello (born , died ) Bishop of Alife

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,948
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,930, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast