Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ercolano Marini

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Adana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1866Born
21 Sep 188922.8Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jun 190437.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Spoleto, Italy
29 Jun 190437.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Archela´s
31 Jul 190437.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Archela´s
11 Dec 190539.0AppointedBishop of Norcia, Italy
2 Jun 191548.5AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
3 Oct 194578.8RetiredArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
3 Oct 194578.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Aprus
27 Oct 194578.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
16 Nov 195083.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ercolano Marini
Archbishop Ercolano Marini (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Amalfi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMatelica
Ordained BishopCathedral, Spoleto, Archdiocese of Spoleto

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 46.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 49, and Page 64
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1904, Number 35
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 88, Number 7,401

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast