Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Ferrandina

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

Titular Bishop of Leptis Magna


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1869BornNapoli
3 Apr 189323.8Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
13 Apr 193868.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
13 Apr 193868.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
1 May 193868.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Leptis Magna
15 Feb 195585.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Ferrandina:
Bishop Alfonso Ferrandina (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 28 Aug 2012
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1938, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013