Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale Dell’Isola

Deceased

Bishop of Cava e Sarno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1868BornNapoli
29 Sep 192860.2AppointedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
11 Nov 192860.3Ordained BishopBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
6 Jan 192960.4InstalledBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy
12 Jan 193869.5DiedBishop of Cava e Sarno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Dell’Isola:
Bishop Pasquale Dell’Isola (born , died ) Bishop of Cava e Sarno

  • a bishop for 9.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 78

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013